FL H3091 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - See SB 2500 (line item 1915A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - See SB 2500 (line item 1915A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the City of Miami Springs - South Royal Poinciana Median.
Title
City of Miami Springs - South Royal Poinciana Median
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Avila [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - House - House Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 1915A) |
2021-03-05 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-04 | House | Favorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-02 | House | Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2021-02-09 | House | Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-04 | House | Filed |