FL H3027 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the ChildNet - Tech Care for Kids Mobile Child Welfare Applications.
Title
ChildNet - Tech Care for Kids Mobile Child Welfare Applications
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Jenne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-22 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/21/17, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/3027 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/3027/BillText/Filed/PDF |