FL H3001 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 1606A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 1606A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Miami Springs Erosion Control and Stabilization of Drainage Canal Phase II.
Title
Miami Springs Erosion Control and Stabilization of Drainage Canal Phase II
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Avila [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 1606A) | |
2017-05-08 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 1606A) |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-21 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/22/17, 8:00 am, Reed Hall --Meeting cancelled |
2017-03-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/21/17, 12:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/3001 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/3001/BillText/Filed/PDF |