FL H2805 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Port Orange Flooding Mitigation and Stormwater Quality Improvement Phase II Including Land Acquisition.
Title
Port Orange Flooding Mitigation and Stormwater Quality Improvement Phase II Including Land Acquisition
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Leek [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/18/18, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-11-27 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-11-16 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/2805 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/2805/BillText/Filed/PDF |