FL H2775 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 1665A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 1665A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Marco Island South Water Treatment Plant West High Service Pump Station.
Title
Marco Island South Water Treatment Plant West High Service Pump Station
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Rommel [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-19 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 1665A) | |
2022-03-14 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 1665A) |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-19 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-19 | House | Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-14 | House | Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-11-18 | House | Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-18 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-18 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-09 | House | Filed |