FL H2709 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the After-School All-Stars.
Title
After-School All-Stars
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-17 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/17/18, 9:00 am, Reed Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-11-27 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-11-15 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/2709 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/2709/BillText/Filed/PDF |