FL H2673 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Died in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Died in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Florida International University - Strategic Land Acquisition.
Title
Florida International University - Strategic Land Acquisition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Died in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/2673 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/2673/BillText/Filed/PDF |