FL H2627 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Hollywood Water Treatment Plant and Southern Regional Wastewater Treatment Plant SCADA Upgrade.
Title
Hollywood Water Treatment Plant and Southern Regional Wastewater Treatment Plant SCADA Upgrade
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-03 | House | Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-01 | House | Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2021-02-04 | House | Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-01 | House | Filed |