FL H2337 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Embrace Families Solutions' Pathways to Home Supportive Housing for Child Welfare Involved Families.
Title
Embrace Families Solutions' Pathways to Home Supportive Housing for Child Welfare Involved Families
Sponsors
Rep. David Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-07 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-06 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-10-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 11/06/19, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2019-10-23 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-10-21 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2337 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2337/BillText/Filed/PDF |