FL H2305 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-24 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-24 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Family Reconnection Program.
Title
Family Reconnection Program
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Jenne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-24 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/18/18, 1:00 pm, Mashburn Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-11-15 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-11-08 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/2305 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/2305/BillText/Filed/PDF |