FL H2269 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Pensacola State College - Roadway/Parking Asphalt.
Title
Pensacola State College - Roadway/Parking Asphalt
Sponsors
Rep. Walter Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | Died in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/2269 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/2269/BillText/Filed/PDF |