FL H2193 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 1635A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 1635A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Belle Glade NW/SW 3rd Avenue, SW Avenue B Extension Corridor Stormwater Conveyance Improvements.
Title
Belle Glade NW/SW 3rd Avenue, SW Avenue B Extension Corridor Stormwater Conveyance Improvements
Sponsors
Sen. Tina Polsky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 1635A) |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-13 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-13 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-11-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 11/13/19, 9:30 am, Morris Hall |
2019-10-16 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-10-10 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2193 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2193/BillText/Filed/PDF |