FL H2073 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 2269A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the JARC Community Works.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JARC Community Works

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-04HouseSee SB 2500 (line item 2269A)
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-21HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2019-02-20HouseFavorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-02-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/20/19, 4:00 pm, Reed Hall
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2019-01-18HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback