FL H2069 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - See SB 2500 (line item s. 152)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - See SB 2500 (line item s. 152)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Seminole State College - Building S (202) Roof Replacement and Building Envelope.
Title
Seminole State College - Building S (202) Roof Replacement and Building Envelope
Sponsors
Rep. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - House - House Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | See SB 2500 (line item s. 152) |
2021-03-15 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-15 | House | Reported out of Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-15 | House | Favorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-11 | House | Added to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-01-24 | House | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | Filed |