FL H2047 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - See SB 2500 (line item 1606A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - See SB 2500 (line item 1606A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Miami Lakes Canal Bank Stabilization Project Phase II.
Title
Miami Lakes Canal Bank Stabilization Project Phase II
Sponsors
Sen. Manny Diaz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 1606A) |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-15 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/15/17, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/2047 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/2047/BillText/Filed/PDF |