FL H1645 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-07 - Chapter No. 2023-348
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-07 - Chapter No. 2023-348
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Gainesville Regional Utilities Authority; establishes authority as governing board of GRU.
Title
City of Gainesville, Alachua County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#48 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#297 (Y: 81 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#297 (Y: 81 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-07 | Chapter No. 2023-348 | |
2023-06-28 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-06-14 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2023-05-04 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2023-05-04 | House | In Messages |
2023-05-04 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Received |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2023-04-27 | Senate | In Messages |
2023-04-27 | House | CS passed; YEAS 81, NAYS 33 |
2023-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-27 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2023-04-27 | House | Amendment 933689 Failed |
2023-04-27 | House | Amendment 411523 Failed |
2023-04-27 | House | Amendment 208369 Failed |
2023-04-27 | House | Amendment 842919 Failed |
2023-04-27 | House | Amendment 489881 Failed |
2023-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-24 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2023) |
2023-04-21 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-04-21 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2023-04-20 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-04-20 | House | CS Filed |
2023-04-20 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2023-04-19 | House | Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee |
2023-04-17 | House | PCS added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2023-04-13 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2023-04-13 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2023-04-10 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-04-10 | House | Filed |