FL H1635 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals resolution of School Board of Hernando County providing for appointed superintendent of schools; provides for an elected superintendent of schools & referendum.
Title
Hernando County School District, Hernando County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#284 (Y: 84 N: 29 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Removed from Local Calendar, 04/29/21 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-23 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2021-04-23 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-23 | House | Passed; YEAS 84, NAYS 29 |
2021-04-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-22 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-22 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-19 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/22/2021) |
2021-04-19 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-19 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-18 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2021-03-23 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported out of Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-03-23 | House | Favorable by Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-03-19 | House | Added to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-16 | House | Now in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-12 | House | Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-05 | House | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-02 | House | Filed |