FL H1619 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/SB 140; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 140 (Ch. 2010-183) -HJ 01168
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/SB 140; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 140 (Ch. 2010-183) -HJ 01168
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creates Florida Farm Fresh Schools Program within DOE; requires program to comply with regulations of National School Lunch Program & meet specified requirements; requires DOE to work with DACS to develop policies that encourage school districts to buy fresh & local food & select foods with maximum nutritional content; requires departments to provide outreach services regarding benefits of fresh food products from state.
Title
School Food Service Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/SB 140; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 140 (Ch. 2010-183) -HJ 01168 | |
2010-04-23 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading -HJ 00966 | |
2010-04-16 | Favorable by- Education Policy Council; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00733; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00733 | |
2010-04-15 | On Council agenda-- Education Policy Council, 04/16/10, 9:00 am, Morris Hall | |
2010-03-19 | Original reference(s) removed: Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC); CS referred to Education Policy Council -HJ 00351; Now in Education Policy Council | |
2010-03-18 | CS read 1st time on 03/18/10 -HJ 00340; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-17 | CS by PreK-12 Policy (EPC); YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 00343 | |
2010-03-15 | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Policy (EPC), 03/17/10, 9:30 am, Morris Hall | |
2010-03-10 | Referred to PreK-12 Policy (EPC); Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC); Education Policy Council -HJ 00258 | |
2010-03-02 | Filed; Introduced -HJ 00147 |
Same As/Similar To
S0140 (Similar To) 2010-06-03 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-183