FL H1569 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1540 (Ch. 2023-260), CS/SB 1542 (Ch. 2023-261)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1540 (Ch. 2023-260), CS/SB 1542 (Ch. 2023-261)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies information obtained by elder & vulnerable adult abuse fatality review team which is exempt or confidential & exempt from public records requirements retains its protected status; provides exemption from public records requirements for personal identifying information of abuse victim & other specified information contained in records held by review team; provides exemption from public meetings requirements for review team meetings during which exempt or confidential & exempt information is discussed; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption.
Title
Pub. Rec. and Meetings/Elder and Vulnerable Adult Abuse Fatality Review Teams
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-24 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1540 (Ch. 2023-260), CS/SB 1542 (Ch. 2023-261) |
2023-04-28 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-04-28 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2023-04-25 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-04-25 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023) |
2023-04-25 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2023-04-24 | House | CS Filed |
2023-04-24 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-04-24 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-04-24 | House | Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-04-23 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2023-03-29 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Reported out of Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Favorable by Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee |
2023-03-27 | House | Added to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-21 | House | Now in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee |
2023-03-21 | House | Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2023-03-21 | House | Favorable by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2023-03-17 | House | Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-09 | House | Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1567 (Related) 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1540 (Ch. 2023-260), CS/SB 1542 (Ch. 2023-261)
S1542 (Similar To) 2023-06-20 - Chapter No. 2023-261, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1540 (Ch. 2023-260)
S1540 (Similar To) 2023-06-20 - Chapter No. 2023-260, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1542 (Ch. 2023-261)
S1542 (Similar To) 2023-06-20 - Chapter No. 2023-261, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1540 (Ch. 2023-260)
S1540 (Similar To) 2023-06-20 - Chapter No. 2023-260, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1542 (Ch. 2023-261)