FL H1553 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises distribution of proceeds from sale of seized migrant property; removes State Apartment Incentive Loan Program & provides for continuation of existing loans; renames State Housing Initiatives Partnership the Program State Housing Initiatives Partnership Block Grant Program; removes municipalities from eligibility under program; provides that FHFC shall distribute moneys appropriated by Legislature; authorizes counties to make subgrants to municipalities according to interlocal agreements; revises counties' authorized uses of local housing distributions relating to rent subsidies; revises eligible counties & distribution calculations under program.
Title
State Housing Assistance Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-16 | House | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1170 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
193 | 018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 183 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 0081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 5061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 507 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 5087 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 5088 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 5095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 517 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 531 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 628 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 9071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 9072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 9073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 9075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 9076 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 9079 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 9089 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 5105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1553 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1553/BillText/Filed/PDF |