FL H1523 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Memorial to Congress of United States, urging Congress to propose an amendment to US Constitution to delete "Punishment Clause," from Thirteenth Amendment.
Title
Deleting Punishment Clause from the Thirteenth Amendment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S730 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1523 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1523/BillText/Filed/PDF |