FL H1495 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits mailing or delivery of unsolicited checks; provides exception; provides penalty; exempts credit card bearers from liability for unauthorized use of such checks.
Title
Consumer Protection
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Cruz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC) | |
2010-03-10 | Referred to Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Policy Council; General Government Policy Council -HJ 00257 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced -HJ 00133 | |
2010-03-01 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0367 (Similar To) 2009-12-14 - Withdrawn prior to introduction -HJ 00037
S0306 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce
S0306 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce