FL H1487 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-266

Summary

Deletes obsolete & repetitive language; provides minimum charter requirements; amends board, election, & term of office provisions; amends compensation for board members to comply with general law; deletes obsolete powers; provides additional district powers, including mosquito control, fire & emergency services, & construction & maintenance of school facilities; provides for applicability of general laws; provides ballot statement;

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Spring Lake Improvement District, Highlands County

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-11 Chapter No. 2010-266
2010-05-26 Approved by Governor
2010-05-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-28 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01287
2010-04-28 Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 00943; Placed on Local Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00949; Read 3rd time -SJ 00949; CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00949
2010-04-26 Received -SJ 00871; Referred to Rules -SJ 00871
2010-04-22 In Messages
2010-04-22 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00909; Read 3rd time -HJ 00909; CS passed; YEAS 106 NAYS 1 -HJ 00909
2010-04-17 Placed on Calendar -HJ 00762
2010-04-16 Favorable by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00762
2010-04-15 On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/16/10, 9:00 am, 404-H
2010-04-14 Favorable by Finance & Tax Council; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00683; Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00683
2010-04-12 Now in Finance & Tax Council -HJ 00662; On Council agenda-- Finance & Tax Council, 04/14/10, 9:15 am, 404-H
2010-04-09 CS read 1st time on 04/09/10 -HJ 00654; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-04-08 CS by Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00656
2010-04-06 On Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 04/08/10, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
2010-03-10 Referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Finance & Tax Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00257
2010-03-02 Introduced -HJ 00133
2010-03-01 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S2756 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1487 (Ch. 2010-266)

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback