FL S2756 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1487 (Ch. 2010-266)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1487 (Ch. 2010-266)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deletes obsolete language and language inconsistent with or repetitive of general law. Deletes obsolete district powers and provides additional district powers including mosquito control, fire and emergency services, construction and maintenance of school facilities, and enforcement of deed restrictions. Provides for applicability of general laws, etc.
Title
Spring Lake Improvement District/Highlands County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1487 (Ch. 2010-266) | |
2010-04-26 | Introduced -SJ 00864; Referred to Rules -SJ 00864 | |
2010-03-03 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1487 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-266