FL H1463 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Office of Secretary & Office of Economic Accountability & Transparency; revises application process & funding for Florida Small Cities Community Development Block Grant Program Fund; revises application process & funding for development grants awarded by DEO to local governments; removes provision providing individuals who voluntarily leave work as result of circumstances relating to domestic violence are ineligible for benefits; requires DEO to implement integrated, modular system hosted in cloud service for reemployment assistance program; revises timeline for employers' responses to notices of benefits claims sent by DEO; authorizes employers to initiate employer-assisted claims relating to mass separations; authorizes claimants to request DEO to reconsider monetary determination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Economic Opportunity

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#203 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#189 (Y: 39 N: 76 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#188 (Y: 39 N: 77 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21SenateReceived
2021-04-21HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-21SenateReferred to Appropriations
2021-04-21SenateIn Messages
2021-04-21HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 118, NAYS 0
2021-04-21HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-20HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-04-20HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-20HouseAmendment 759951 adopted
2021-04-20HouseAmendment 813723 Failed
2021-04-20HouseAmendment 877777 Failed
2021-04-20HouseAmendment 495263 Failed
2021-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-16HouseAmendment 495263 filed
2021-04-16HouseAmendment 813723 filed
2021-04-16HouseAmendment 877777 filed
2021-04-16HouseAmendment 759951 filed
2021-04-15House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2021-04-15HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2021)
2021-04-15HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-04-15HouseCS Filed
2021-04-15HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-04-14HouseReported out of Commerce Committee
2021-04-14HouseFavorable with CS by Commerce Committee
2021-04-12HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2021-04-06HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2021-04-06HouseReported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-04-06HouseFavorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-04-05House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-04-02HouseAdded to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
2021-04-02HouseNow in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-04-02HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-04-02HouseReferred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-04-02HouseOriginal reference removed: Government Operations Subcommittee
2021-04-02HouseCS Filed
2021-04-02HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-04-02HouseReported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-04-01HouseFavorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-30HouseAdded to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-05HouseNow in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Government Operations Subcommittee
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1291 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
S1640 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - Introduced
S1948 (Same As) 2021-04-22 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1463
S1906 (Similar To) 2021-04-22 - CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1004015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1420195Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2060Amended CodeSee Bill Text
213053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220194Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2880656Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2881089Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2881251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2888014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288955Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2889604Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288987Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2900065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
290042Amended CodeSee Bill Text
290044Amended CodeSee Bill Text
290046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31109Amended CodeSee Bill Text
311105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3313081Amended CodeSee Bill Text
334065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3734149Amended CodeSee Bill Text
380045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4030752Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4200005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4200006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
420101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
420503Amended CodeSee Bill Text
420504Amended CodeSee Bill Text
420506Amended CodeSee Bill Text
420507Amended CodeSee Bill Text
420511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
420602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
420609Amended CodeSee Bill Text
420622Amended CodeSee Bill Text
427012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
443036Amended CodeSee Bill Text
443091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
443101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4431113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4431116Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4431118Amended CodeSee Bill Text
443151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44653Amended CodeSee Bill Text
450261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55379Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6245105Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1463
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1463/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1463/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1463/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1463/BillText/e1/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1463/Amendment/276311/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1463/Amendment/495263/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1463/Amendment/877777/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1463/Amendment/813723/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1463/Amendment/759951/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1463/Analyses/h1463.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1463/Analyses/h1463a.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1463/Analyses/h1463b.ITA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1463/Analyses/h1463c.ITA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1463/Analyses/h1463d.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1463/Analyses/h1463e.COM.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1463/Vote/HouseVote_h01463c2188.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1463/Vote/HouseVote_h01463c2189.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1463/Vote/HouseVote_h01463e1203.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback