FL H1457 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Department of Labor; provides structure & purpose of department; revises requirements notifying employees of certain rights; designates department as state Agency for Workforce Innovation for purposes of implementing s. 24, Art. X of State Constitution; revises provisions relating to state minimum wage including, protected rights, rebuttable presumption & burden of proof, prohibition on certain contracts, process for filing complaint for violation of protected rights, department powers, injunctive relief, review of actions issued by department, statute of limitations during investigation, liability, & recordkeeping; creates the DOL Community Advisory Board; requires annual report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Labor

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30HouseDied in Government Operations Subcommittee
2021-03-05HouseNow in Government Operations Subcommittee
2021-03-05HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Government Operations Subcommittee
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1726 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Commerce and Tourism

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
448109Amended CodeSee Bill Text
448110Amended CodeSee Bill Text
448111Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback