FL S1726 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Department of Labor, headed by the Secretary of Labor, who is appointed by the Governor and confirmed by the Senate; designating the Department of Labor as the state Agency for Workforce Innovation for purposes of implementing s. 24, Art. X of the State Constitution; authorizing the department to conduct investigations, issue citations, enforce and collect judgments by certain means, and enter into agreements with other agencies to assist it with administration and enforcement, etc.
Title
Department of Labor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1457 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
448 | 109 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
448 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1726 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1726/BillText/Filed/HTML |