FL H1451 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Dan Marino Foundation Florida Vocational College in Broward County as public residential postsecondary school for certain students who have developmental disabilities; provides funding for school through DOE subject to specific appropriation; requires school to comply with laws & rules applicable to state agencies unless otherwise provided by law.
Title
Dan Marino Foundation Florida Vocational College
Sponsors
Rep. Jose Diaz [R] | Rep. Eduardo Gonzalez [R] | House Health and Human Services Committee | Rep. Peter Nehr [R] |
Rep. Ari Porth [D] | Rep. Patrick Rooney [R] | Rep. James Waldman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-15 | Original reference(s) removed: Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee | |
2011-04-14 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-04-13 | CS by Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 1 -HJ 645 | |
2011-04-11 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/13/11, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall | |
2011-03-18 | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee; Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee -HJ 258 | |
2011-03-11 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1000 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |