FL H1433 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain facilities to provide opportunity to designate caregiver for patient's aftercare; provides that facilities are not responsible for facilitating or providing recommendations for designated caregivers; authorizes change of designations; requires facilities to document certain information; requires facilities to notify patient's designated caregiver of patient's discharge or transfer; provides facilities, facility employees, & persons under contract with facility immunity from liability in administrative, civil, & criminal actions for certain acts or omissions of designated caregivers; requires AHCA to adopt rules.
Title
Designated Caregivers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Now in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1878 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1433 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1433/BillText/Filed/PDF |