FL S1878 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring certain facilities to provide patients admitted for inpatient treatment or their legal representatives with an opportunity to designate a caregiver for the patient's aftercare within a specified timeframe; requiring facilities to notify a patient's designated caregiver of the patient's discharge or transfer from the facility within a specified timeframe; providing facilities, facility employees, and persons under contract with a facility immunity from liability in administrative, civil, and criminal actions for certain acts or omissions of designated caregivers, etc.
Title
Designated Caregivers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1433 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1878 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1878/BillText/Filed/HTML |