FL H1423 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deletes legislative intent provision regarding certain not-for-profit organizations & background screening for such organizations; revises definition; defines term "not-for-profit organization or municipal government"; provides certain provisions do not apply to not-for-profit organizations & municipal governments; requires certain employees of not-for-profit organizations & municipal governments to meet certain background screening requirements; creates study group.
Title
After-school Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Education Committee |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to Education Committee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0133 (Similar To) 2015-11-17 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S0156 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
S0156 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1006 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
435 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1423 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1423/BillText/Filed/PDF |