FL H1419 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes New Charter Application Commission; provides purpose & composition of commission; provides members serve without compensation; provides that both local school district sponsor & commission will function as charter school authorizers; revises provisions related to charter school applications & review & denial of such applications; provides duties of local school districts that did not function as charter school authorizers.
Title
Establishment of Charter Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Now in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1031 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Education & Employment Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1028 (Ch. 2021-35)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1419 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1419/BillText/Filed/PDF |