FL H1383 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Reduction In Black Female & Women's Maternal Mortality Grant Program within DOH; provides purpose & requirements for program; & provides appropriation.
Title
Reduction in Black Female and Women's Maternal Mortality Grant Program
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Antone [D] | Rep. Marie Woodson [D] | Rep. Christopher Benjamin [D] | Rep. Kevin Chambliss [D] |
Rep. Christine Hunschofsky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1462 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1383 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1383/BillText/Filed/PDF |