FL H1377 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to State Constitution to authorize Legislature to prohibit consideration of changes or improvements made to real property used for residential purposes to improve property's resistance to flood damage in determining assessed value of such property for ad valorem taxation purposes.
Title
Limitation on Assessment of Real Property Used for Residential Purposes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#24 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#206 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#206 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State | |
2021-04-26 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2021-04-26 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Substituted for SJR 1182 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-21 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-04-21 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-21 | House | Passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-20 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-15 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2021) |
2021-04-15 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2021-04-08 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported out of Ways & Means Committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Favorable by Ways & Means Committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda |
2021-03-15 | House | Now in Ways & Means Committee |
2021-03-15 | House | Reported out of Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2021-03-15 | House | Favorable by Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2021-03-11 | House | Added to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-05 | House | Now in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1379 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HJR 1377 (Passed)
S1182 (Same As) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HJR 1377 (Passed), HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
S1186 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HJR 1377 (Passed)
H7061 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Chapter No. 2021-31
S1182 (Same As) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HJR 1377 (Passed), HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
S1186 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HJR 1377 (Passed)
H7061 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Chapter No. 2021-31