FL H1375 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises eligibility for discount on ad valorem taxation for certain disabled veterans.
Title
Property Tax Discount for Disabled Veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Ways & Means Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Now in Ways & Means Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1373 (Related) 2024-03-08 - Died in Ways & Means Committee
S1684 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations
S1686 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations
S1684 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations
S1686 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1375 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1375/BillText/Filed/PDF |