FL H1371 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
Pending: House Civil Justice and Property Rights Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes unit owners of condominiums & homeowners to display up to two specified flags regardless of governing documents of association; removes restriction on unit owners that flags may only be flown on certain days; defines the term "first responder flag"; authorizes civil cause of action; provides for attorney fees & costs; prohibits certain homeowners' association from precluding property owners from displaying certain flags; requires such flags be displayed in certain manner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Display of Flags in Residential Associations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-14HouseNow in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2022-01-14HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2022-01-14HouseReferred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1716 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Introduced
H465 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Added to Second Reading Calendar
S438 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Now in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
718113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7203075Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback