FL H1363 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that person is disqualified from receiving compensation under Victims of Wrongful Incarceration Compensation Act if, before or after person's wrongful conviction & incarceration, person was convicted of or pled guilty or nolo contendere to violent felony; provides that wrongfully incarcerated person who commits violent felony law violation that results in revocation of parole or community supervision is ineligible for compensation.
Title
Compensation of Victims of Wrongful Incarceration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 215 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 134 | |
2012-01-06 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
961 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1363 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1363/BillText/Filed/PDF |