FL H1353 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7087 (Ch. 2016-240)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7087 (Ch. 2016-240)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Telehealth Task Force within AHCA; requires task force to compile & analyze certain data & to conduct comparative analysis of health insurance coverage available for telehealth services & for in-person treatment; requires task force to submit report to Governor & Legislature; provides for repeal; authorizes certain licensed or certified health care professionals to provide telehealth services.
Title
Telehealth
Sponsors
Rep. Mia Jones [D] | Rep. Mark Pafford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Health Quality Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7087 (Ch. 2016-240) |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1686 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7087 (Ch. 2016-240)
H7087 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-240
H7087 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-240
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
408 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1353 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1353/BillText/Filed/PDF |