FL H1347 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides additional staffing requirements for special needs shelters to provide services to persons with mental health & substance use disorders; requires special needs shelters to establish designated shelter areas for persons with mental health & substance use disorders; provides for reimbursement of qualified professionals, access centers, & addictions receiving facilities.
Title
Special Needs Shelters for Persons with Mental Health and Substance Use Disorders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Health Quality Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-12 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-08 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1347 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1347/BillText/Filed/PDF |