FL H1347 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-190
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-190
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts credit unions from regulation under Florida Deceptive & Unfair Trade Practices Act.
Title
Application of the Florida Deceptive and Unfair Trade Practices Act to Credit Unions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#95 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#95 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Chapter No. 2017-190 | |
2017-06-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-06-14 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-04-27 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2017-04-27 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Substituted for SB 1620 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2017-04-12 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-05 | House | CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/04/17 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-03-29 | House | Favorable by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 29 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 03/29/17, 8:30 am, Webster Hall |
2017-03-23 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-20 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-20 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-16 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/20/17, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-03-10 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1620 (Similar To) 2017-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1347 (Ch. 2017-190)