FL H1345 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Local Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Local Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Wakulla County Airport Authority; provides for purpose & classification as dependent special district, powers, membership of governing board, annual adoption of budget, & reporting & audit requirements; prohibits authority's levy of ad valorem taxes.
Title
Wakulla County
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Shoaf [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Local Administration Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Local Administration Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1345 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1345/BillText/Filed/PDF |