FL H1337 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to s. 1, Art. IV of State Constitution to remove Governor's constitutional authority to fill vacancies in appointed or elected county office.
Title
Authority of Governor to Fill Vacancies in County Office
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Government Operations Subcommittee | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 215 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 132 | |
2012-01-06 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1337 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1337/BillText/Filed/PDF |