FL H1333 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Emergency Residential Property Insurance Assistance Trust Fund within DFS; provides purpose, funding, & administration of trust fund; provides eligibility for trust fund; provides for future review & termination or re-creation of trust fund.
Title
Trust Fund/Creation/Emergency Residential Property Insurance Assistance Trust Funds/DFS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-05 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1333 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1333/BillText/Filed/PDF |