FL H1333 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Chapter No. 2015-206
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adds optional benefits; provides required minimum distributions; provides for retirement after 10 years of service; provides death benefits, additional benefits, & protection of benefits; provides maximum pension; provides for plan termination; provides for forfeitures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund of the City of Pensacola, Escambia County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#29 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#341 (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-18 Chapter No. 2015-206
2015-06-10 Approved by Governor
2015-05-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-29HouseOrdered enrolled
2015-04-29SenateCS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2015-04-29SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-29SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-29SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2015-04-27SenatePlaced on Local Calendar, 04/29/15
2015-04-24SenateReceived
2015-04-24SenateReferred to Rules
2015-04-24SenateIn Messages
2015-04-24HouseCS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 1
2015-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/15
2015-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-04-09HouseFavorable by- Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2015-04-07HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 04/09/15, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2015-04-02HouseNow in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
2015-04-02HouseFavorable by State Affairs Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2015-03-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/02/15, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2015-03-27HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2015-03-26HouseCS by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-03-26HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-25HouseCS by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2015-03-23HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local Government Affairs Subcommittee, 03/25/15, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2015-03-19HouseIntroduced
2015-03-19HouseReferred to Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee
2015-03-19HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback