FL H1329 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 1716
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides honorary designations of certain transportation facilities in specified counties; directs DOT to erect suitable markers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Facility Designations Honoring Fallen Law Enforcement Officers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20HouseLaid on Table, refer to SB 1716
2021-04-20HouseSubstituted SB 1716
2021-04-15HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2021)
2021-04-15HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-15HouseBill released to House Calendar
2021-04-15HouseReported out of Commerce Committee
2021-04-14HouseFavorable by Commerce Committee
2021-04-12HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2021-03-30HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2021-03-30HouseReported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-30HouseFavorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-26HouseAdded to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-24HouseNow in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-24HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-03-24HouseReferred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-23House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-03-23HouseCS Filed
2021-03-23HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-03-23HouseReported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-22HouseFavorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-18HousePCS added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-05HouseNow in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1716 (Similar To) 2021-06-18 - Approved by Governor

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1329
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1329/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1329/BillText/c1/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1329/Analyses/h1329.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1329/Analyses/h1329a.ITA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1329/Analyses/h1329b.ITA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1329/Analyses/h1329c.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1329/Analyses/h1329d.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1329/Analyses/h1329z.TIE.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=58950&IsPCB=1&BillId=72503
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=59580&IsPCB=0&BillId=72503
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=60300&IsPCB=0&BillId=72503

Bill Comments 750

feedback