FL H1329 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requests Congress to adopt budgetary & other measures to reduce income inequality.
Title
Reducing Income Inequality
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Smith [D] | Rep. Joseph Abruzzo [D] | Rep. Nicholas Duran [D] | Rep. Joseph Geller [D] |
Rep. Amy Mercado [D] | Rep. David Richardson [D] | Rep. Barrington Russell [D] | Rep. Clovis Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-12 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1658 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1329 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1329/BillText/Filed/PDF |