FL H1325 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1098
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1098
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to West Palm Beach Firefighters Pension Fund; revises definitions; provides for ch. 175 funds to be used to reduce member contributions to pension fund for specified calendar years; provides that city shall make up certain shortfalls in member contributions; provides for reduction in member contributions for 2 years; revises fixed rate for certain members; requires members to take lump sum distribution of their entire share account balance within specified time after their termination of employment in certain circumstances; deletes provision requiring members to elect to participate in BackDROP within specified time or forfeit their benefits; provides lower interest rate for BackDROP benefits for retirements after certain date; revises BackDROP benefits; revises availability of loans for certain members.
Title
City of West Palm Beach, Palm Beach County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#29 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#996 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#996 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1098 | |
2012-03-05 | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 -SJ 803 | |
2012-03-05 | Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 799 | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Rules -SJ 762 | |
2012-03-01 | Received -SJ 762 | |
2012-02-29 | In Messages | |
2012-02-29 | Passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 -HJ 955 | |
2012-02-29 | Read 3rd time -HJ 954 | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-28 | Read 2nd time -HJ 898 | |
2012-02-24 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/12 | |
2012-02-09 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 573 | |
2012-02-08 | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 573 | |
2012-02-06 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 02/08/12, 8:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2012-01-31 | Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 321 | |
2012-01-31 | Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 321 | |
2012-01-27 | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 01/31/12, 9:00 am, Morris Hall | |
2012-01-25 | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee -HJ 299 | |
2012-01-25 | Favorable by Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 299 | |
2012-01-23 | On Committee agenda-- Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee, 01/25/12, 8:00 am, Webster Hall | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 214 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 130 | |
2012-01-06 | Filed |