FL H1323 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates act "The Enhancing Crime-Solving Potential and Reliability of the Criminal Justice System Act"; provides that governmental entities only required to maintain evidence for potential DNA testing for specified serious crimes; provides that only portion of piece of evidence that is likely to contain biological evidence must be retained & other portions may be disposed of when retention is impracticable, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Evidence of Crimes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP)
2010-03-03 Referred to Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00206
2010-03-02 Introduced -HJ 00120
2010-02-25 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S2522 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
092511Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback