FL H1311 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Education & Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Education & Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Office of Blue Economy; provides that office shall be housed within state university & administered by Board of Governors; provides duties of office; requires office to annually provide certain report to Governor & Legislature.
Title
Office of the Blue Economy
Sponsors
House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | Rep. Chip LaMarca [R] | Rep. Kelly Skidmore [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - House - House Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Education & Employment Committee |
2024-02-13 | House | Now in Education & Employment Committee |
2024-02-13 | House | Reported out of Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-13 | House | Favorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-09 | House | Added to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2024-02-07 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-02-07 | House | Now in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-07 | House | Original reference removed: Commerce Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Original reference removed: Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-06 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-02-02 | House | Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-13 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1754 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
H1285 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Chapter No. 2024-101; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7002 (Ch. 2024-159), CS/SB 7004 (Ch. 2024-160)
H1285 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Chapter No. 2024-101; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7002 (Ch. 2024-159), CS/SB 7004 (Ch. 2024-160)