FL H1311 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises exemption from licensure to increase aggregate face value of payment instruments that may be cashed.
Title
Check Cashing Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall --Temporarily Postponed |
2018-01-12 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1126 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1311 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1311/BillText/Filed/PDF |